TN SB0206 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes an obsolete provision that temporarily prohibited a municipality from annexing territory by ordinance and required a review and evaluation of annexation laws. - Amends TCA Title 6 and Title 64.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6 and Title 64, relative to municipal boundaries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateSponsor change.
2023-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0443 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback