TN SB0206 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, elevates the Class A misdemeanor offense of assault to the Class E felony offense of aggravated assault for assaulting a law enforcement officer while the officer is discharging official duties if the person knows or should know the victim is a law enforcement officer. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, elevates the Class A misdemeanor offense of assault to the Class E felony offense of aggravated assault for assaulting a law enforcement officer while the officer is discharging official duties if the person knows or should know the victim is a law enforcement officer. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0168 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback