TN SB0206 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of transportation, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of transportation, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 327 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/30/11 | |
2011-05-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-20 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-19 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0449) | |
2011-05-19 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-18 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-16 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-16 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0528) | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0655 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327