TN SB0206 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases from 5,000 to 25,000 barrels per year the amount of beer that a manufacturer may sell as a retailer; authorizes such a manufacturer to hold license as a hotel, as alternative to holding license as a restaurant, if beer sold on hotel premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, increases from 5,000 to 25,000 barrels per year the amount of beer that a manufacturer may sell as a retailer; authorizes such a manufacturer to hold license as a hotel, as alternative to holding license as a restaurant, if beer sold on hotel premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-02 Pub. Ch. 290
2009-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/27/09
2009-05-27 Signed by Governor.
2009-05-21 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2009-05-21 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-05-19 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-05-19 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2009-05-18 Passed H., Ayes 76, Nays 18, PNV 2
2009-05-18 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0309)
2009-05-18 Subst. for comp. HB.
2009-05-11 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2009-05-07 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2009-05-07 Passed S. as am., Ayes 20, Nays 3
2009-05-07 S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0269)
2009-05-05 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/07/2009
2009-04-29 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2009-04-23 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009
2009-04-20 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
2009-04-16 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/20/2009
2009-04-14 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/21/2009
2009-04-09 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-04 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0214 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 290

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback