TN SB0205 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the factors a court may consider in determining whether termination of parental rights is in the best interest of the child; clarifies that the court is not required to consider all factors and may consider relevant factors other than those listed. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1, relative to termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 190 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5, PNV 2 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0200 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 190