TN SB0205 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state insurance committee, the local government insurance committee and the local education insurance committee to contract for, or delegate resolution of, the application of medical necessity guidelines; requires that any proposed change in the group insurance plan for public employees that would place a tobacco surcharge on employees based on specific lifestyle choices not take effect until January 1, 2011.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state insurance committee, the local government insurance committee and the local education insurance committee to contract for, or delegate resolution of, the application of medical necessity guidelines; requires that any proposed change in the group insurance plan for public employees that would place a tobacco surcharge on employees based on specific lifestyle choices not take effect until January 1, 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Pub. Ch. 502 | |
2009-07-07 | Effective date(s) 06/25/09; 01/01/10 | |
2009-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-19 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-17 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-16 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-15 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 6/16/09 | |
2009-06-12 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 25, Nays 1 | |
2009-06-12 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (3) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | H. Conf. comm. appointed. (Matheny, Litz, McCord) | |
2009-06-09 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 6/9/09 | |
2009-06-09 | S. Conf. comm. appointed. (Stewart, Overbey, Tracy) | |
2009-06-09 | S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence in H. am. 5 | |
2009-06-08 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | S. Reset on cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | H. refused to recede from am. no. 5 | |
2009-06-02 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/3/09 | |
2009-06-02 | S. refused to concur in am. 5 | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA0621) | |
2009-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0616) | |
2009-05-21 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - HA0625) | |
2009-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0152) | |
2009-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0583) | |
2009-05-21 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-30 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-27 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-27 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0132) | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/27/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/23/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/20/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0280 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 502