TN SB0204 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Rule of Law Life Act". - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2, relative to abortion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0724 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback