TN SB0203 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that directors, trustees, or members of nonprofit corporations, associations, and organizations that are organized for religious purposes may be immune from suits arising from the conduct of the affairs of such entities if the conduct does not amount to willful, wanton, or gross negligence. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 58.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that directors, trustees, or members of nonprofit corporations, associations, and organizations that are organized for religious purposes may be immune from suits arising from the conduct of the affairs of such entities if the conduct does not amount to willful, wanton, or gross negligence. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 58.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0171 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback