TN SB0203 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires every LEA to make at least one early postsecondary opportunity available for high school students. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires every LEA to make at least one early postsecondary opportunity available for high school students. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0239 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-01 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback