TN SB0201 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates June 19 of each year as "Juneteenth," a day of special observance. - Amends TCA Title 15.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, relative to Juneteenth.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 89 | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0394 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021