TN SB0201 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires certain public entities to disclose to the office of the comptroller events of default; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 9-21-151.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires certain public entities to disclose to the office of the comptroller events of default; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 9-21-151.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 6
2019-02-28SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019
2019-02-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0166 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 6

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback