TN SB0200 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a presumption that a firefighter or emergency medical services personnel diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) sustained the injury in the line of duty for purposes of workers' compensation; allows for the presumption to be rebutted by evidence that the PTSD was caused by nonservice-connected risk factors or exposure. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a presumption that a firefighter or emergency medical services personnel diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) sustained the injury in the line of duty for purposes of workers' compensation; allows for the presumption to be rebutted by evidence that the PTSD was caused by nonservice-connected risk factors or exposure. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0780 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback