TN SB0200 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 975
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, includes within the offense of especially aggravated stalking a person 18 years of age or older who commits the offense of stalking or aggravated stalking against a victim who is less than 12 years of age at any time during the person's course of conduct. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-315.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, includes within the offense of especially aggravated stalking a person 18 years of age or older who commits the offense of stalking or aggravated stalking against a victim who is less than 12 years of age at any time during the person's course of conduct. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-315.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 975
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-25SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-24HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-24SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-24SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018
2017-05-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-05-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
2017-05-01SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017
2017-04-12SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2017-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017
2017-04-11SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0294 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 975

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback