TN SB0199 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the elder abuse task force. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 71 and Chapter 961 of the Public Acts of 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the elder abuse task force. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 71 and Chapter 961 of the Public Acts of 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 135
2019-03-18SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-12SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate to Calendar Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0249 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 135

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback