TN SB0195 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes, from $7.25 to $12, the minimum hourly wage for employees within the state. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, Chapter 2, relative to the minimum wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1577 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback