TN SB0195 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act," which requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act," which requires health insurance coverage to cover hypofractionated proton therapy in the same manner as it covers intensity modulated radiation therapy under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0068)
2019-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 1
2019-04-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0089)
2019-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0172)
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0184 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback