TN SB0195 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, exempts certain non-profit, online universities from the Postsecondary Education Authorization Act; specifies circumstances under which such an university may lose the exemption. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, exempts certain non-profit, online universities from the Postsecondary Education Authorization Act; specifies circumstances under which such an university may lose the exemption. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 20.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HousePub. Ch. 185
2013-04-29HouseEffective date(s) 04/23/2013
2013-04-23HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-11HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-10HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-10HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 74, Nays 18
2013-04-10HouseAm. tabled.
2013-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-01SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-03-28SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-03-28SenatePassed S., Ayes 26, Nays 1, PNV 3
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013
2013-03-27SenateS. Reset on Cal. for 3/28/2013
2013-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2013
2013-03-25SenateS. Reset on cal. for 3/27/2013
2013-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/25/2013
2013-03-21SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-03-14SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/21/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0189 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 185

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback