TN SB0195 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the committee for purchase from the blind and other severely disabled, June 30, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 4, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the committee for purchase from the blind and other severely disabled, June 30, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 4, Part 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 23
2011-03-07 Comp. HB subst.
2011-03-03 Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/7/2011
2011-03-02 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-02-23 Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/2/2011
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-25 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0644 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 23

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback