TN SB0195 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires state treasurer to make certified public administrator's educational incentive payments to sheriffs irrespective of other supplements received for in-service training or professional development. - Amends TCA Section 5-1-310.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires state treasurer to make certified public administrator's educational incentive payments to sheriffs irrespective of other supplements received for in-service training or professional development. - Amends TCA Section 5-1-310.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-04 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0271 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback