TN SB0194 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "alternative treatments," for purposes of the requirement that prescribing physicians explain reasonable alternatives to opioids, as including chiropractic care, physical therapy, acupuncture, and other treatments that relieve pain without the use of opioids. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-164.
Title
As enacted, defines "alternative treatments," for purposes of the requirement that prescribing physicians explain reasonable alternatives to opioids, as including chiropractic care, physical therapy, acupuncture, and other treatments that relieve pain without the use of opioids. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-164.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 117 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0150 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117