TN SB0193 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a person who registered to vote by mail or online and who is voting for the first time to vote absentee by applying to vote absentee at any county election commission office. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a person who registered to vote by mail or online and who is voting for the first time to vote absentee by applying to vote absentee at any county election commission office. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0145 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee