TN SB0193 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts persons who are 100 or older from the Hall income tax for tax years beginning January 1, 2018, and thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, exempts persons who are 100 or older from the Hall income tax for tax years beginning January 1, 2018, and thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 453 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5-9-17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0331 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 453