TN SB0192 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the civil service commission, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 8, Chapter 30, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the civil service commission, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 8, Chapter 30, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 173 | |
2011-04-18 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-04-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0242) | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0642 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 173