TN SB0192 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that victims are not required to pay court costs and attendant fees for ex parte orders of protection; exempts victims from liability for court costs and attendant fees associated with dismissal or nonsuit of an ex parte order of protection, order of protection, or a petition for either such order. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that victims are not required to pay court costs and attendant fees for ex parte orders of protection; exempts victims from liability for court costs and attendant fees associated with dismissal or nonsuit of an ex parte order of protection, order of protection, or a petition for either such order. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 263 | |
2009-05-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0125) | |
2009-05-04 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/04/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 3/11/09 | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/4/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0268 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 263