TN SB0189 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to inform LEAs before each school year if sufficient funds have been appropriated to pay the cost of the required college entrance examination for students who want to take the examination a second time. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to inform LEAs before each school year if sufficient funds have been appropriated to pay the cost of the required college entrance examination for students who want to take the examination a second time. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0398 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.