TN SB0187 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes certain restrictions on requiring persons to be vaccinated for the SARS-CoV-2 virus. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 68, relative to health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 513
2021-04-28SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0013 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 513

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback