TN SB0185 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the wildlife resources commission, June 30, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, extends the wildlife resources commission, June 30, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0398) | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0258 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-06 - Failed In s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee