TN SB0184 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the professional privilege tax for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Section 49-7-2109 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-7-2109 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17, relative to the privilege tax imposed on persons engaged in certain occupations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0987 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback