TN SB0181 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires corporations to implement certain measures and maintain certain records when allowing shareholder meetings to be conducted by remote means. - Amends TCA Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 48, relative to meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, referred to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 85 | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0106 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021