TN SB0181 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exception to the offense of possession of a machine gun, short-barreled rifle or shotgun, or a firearm silencer that the person was in compliance with the National Firearms Act when possessing. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1302.
Title
As enacted, creates an exception to the offense of possession of a machine gun, short-barreled rifle or shotgun, or a firearm silencer that the person was in compliance with the National Firearms Act when possessing. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1302.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 85 | |
2015-04-20 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2015 | |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 4 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0136 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 85