TN SB0177 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing self-distribution by certain beer manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 5, relative to distribution of beer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2021 | |
2021-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 432 | |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 75, Nays 12, PNV 2 |
2021-04-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0240) |
2021-04-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0151) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0189 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 432