TN SB0175 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes, from six months to 12 months, the permitted holding period by a bank for non-real-property acquired in satisfaction of a loan. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45, relative to property held by banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0058 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2021