TN SB0167 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that any legislation of the house of representatives that creates an exception to the requirement deeming records of public entities to be open for inspection by the public must be referred to the government operations committee according to the rules of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, provides that any legislation of the house of representatives that creates an exception to the requirement deeming records of public entities to be open for inspection by the public must be referred to the government operations committee according to the rules of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0086 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 221