TN SB0167 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the commissioner, for good cause, to extend the six-month period within which a claim against the state for costs must be submitted to the department by an additional six months; effective until June 30, 2018. - Amends TCA Section 40-25-144.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the commissioner, for good cause, to extend the six-month period within which a claim against the state for costs must be submitted to the department by an additional six months; effective until June 30, 2018. - Amends TCA Section 40-25-144.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11 Pub. Ch. 85
2017-04-11 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-04-05SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-03-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-03-27HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-03-27SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-03-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-03-23HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-03-23HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-03-23HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0109)
2017-03-23HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-03-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-03-20SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2017-03-20SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0119)
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1274 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 85

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback