TN SB0166 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that a student may only enroll in two course access program courses per school year, unless additional courses are approved by the student's home LEA, and that students must pay all tuition and fees required for any additional courses taken during the same year; requires a home LEA to pay the required tuition and fees to a host LEA for the first two course access program courses in which a student is enrolled per school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that a student may only enroll in two course access program courses per school year, unless additional courses are approved by the student's home LEA, and that students must pay all tuition and fees required for any additional courses taken during the same year; requires a home LEA to pay the required tuition and fees to a host LEA for the first two course access program courses in which a student is enrolled per school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-02-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0241 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback