TN SB0157 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $50 to $100 the maximum amount that the state will match to an employee's optional retirement plan; deletes an obsolete provision related to the state match for an employee's optional retirement plan. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 25, relative to retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0008 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-12 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee