TN SB0157 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Master Development Plan Recognition Act". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 41; Title 42; Title 49; Title 64; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Master Development Plan Recognition Act". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 41; Title 42; Title 49; Title 64; Title 68 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 852 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0132 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 852