TN SB0153 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee board of judicial conduct to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee board of judicial conduct to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: FINAL CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: FINAL CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 406 | |
2019-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2019 | |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0367) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/6/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0485 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406