TN SB0149 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, places restrictions on receiving school bus driver license endorsements or being hired as a school bus driver for drivers who have committed serious traffic violations, including excessive speeding or reckless driving. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, places restrictions on receiving school bus driver license endorsements or being hired as a school bus driver for drivers who have committed serious traffic violations, including excessive speeding or reckless driving. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2017-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0500) |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0343) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0089 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.