TN SB0147 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the use of electronic signatures for a written request by members of the general assembly to convene for extraordinary session in accordance with the Constitution of Tennessee, Article II, ยง 8. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 1, relative to legislative sessions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0129 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021