TN SB0147 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Open Carry Firearms Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Open Carry Firearms Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0040 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee