TN SB0146 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee public television council to June 30, 2025; adds the chairs of the government operations committees of the senate and house to the list of persons who receive an annual report of service provided and requests for appropriations. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 50, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee public television council to June 30, 2025; adds the chairs of the government operations committees of the senate and house to the list of persons who receive an annual report of service provided and requests for appropriations. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 50, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 212 | |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0478 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 212