TN SB0145 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the real estate commission to approve any continuing education course that is at least one hour long if it meets all requirements that are not related to course length; supersedes current rule that requires courses be at least two hours long. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, requires the real estate commission to approve any continuing education course that is at least one hour long if it meets all requirements that are not related to course length; supersedes current rule that requires courses be at least two hours long. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 61 | |
2015-04-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/16/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0248 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 61