TN SB0141 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the private probation services council to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the private probation services council to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 9.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-26SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-25SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0136)
2019-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/20/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0473 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback