TN SB0135 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides a mechanism by which a public records custodian may enter into mediation with a records requestor for the purpose of stopping requests that constitute harassment; if mediation fails, authorizes a records custodian to seek an injunction against the records requestor. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5, relative to records requests.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0197 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback