TN SB0135 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates bridge on U.S. Highway 64 in Lincoln County as "William R. Carter Memorial Bridge."
Title
As enacted, designates bridge on U.S. Highway 64 in Lincoln County as "William R. Carter Memorial Bridge."
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Pub. Ch. 108 | |
2011-04-28 | Effective date(s) 04/25/11 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-13 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-11 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-11 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-03-21 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-17 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/17/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/2/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0152 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108