TN SB0135 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a development district board to borrow such funds as it deems necessary to fund the construction of a building for its own use, and to mortgage or otherwise pledge its real property or other assets to secure such a loan. - Amends TCA Title 13.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a development district board to borrow such funds as it deems necessary to fund the construction of a building for its own use, and to mortgage or otherwise pledge its real property or other assets to secure such a loan. - Amends TCA Title 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 730 | |
2010-03-24 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0917) | |
2010-03-24 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action def. in S&L Gov't Comm to 3/10/10 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/17/2010 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0187 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 730