TN SB0134 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at the Historic Jackson Theater, the Jonesborough Repertory Theatre, the International Storytelling Center, the McKinney Center, the Jonesborough Visitor Center, the Historic Eureka Inn, and the AmericInn Lodge and Suites, all located in Jonesborough. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-102, relative to consumption of alcoholic beverages on premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |