TN SB0134 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that post-employment benefit trusts that are established to provide non-pension benefits to former public employees are irrevocable trusts. - Amends TCA Section 8-50-1204.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that post-employment benefit trusts that are established to provide non-pension benefits to former public employees are irrevocable trusts. - Amends TCA Section 8-50-1204.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Consent Calendar (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Consent Calendar (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Pub. Ch. 140 |
2013-04-24 | House | Effective date(s) 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/7/2013 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/5/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0061 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 140