TN SB0133 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department, in collaboration with other public and private healthcare agencies, to incorporate information about Alzheimer’s disease and other dementias into its existing public health programs and services. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63 and Title 68, relative to dementia education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/1/2021
2021-02-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
2021-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0828 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback